Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017