06/01/2017 | Effective immediately | |||
06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |