Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#322
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
11/15/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|