House | 05/11/2017 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |