Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB357 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Huberty, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 357
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, rereferred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of the children of certain first
 responders for free prekindergarten programs in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.153(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A child is eligible for enrollment in a prekindergarten
 class under this section if the child is at least three years of age
 and:
 (1)  is unable to speak and comprehend the English
 language;
 (2)  is educationally disadvantaged;
 (3)  is a homeless child, as defined by 42 U.S.C.
 Section 11434a, regardless of the residence of the child, of either
 parent of the child, or of the child's guardian or other person
 having lawful control of the child;
 (4)  is the child of an active duty member of the armed
 forces of the United States, including the state military forces or
 a reserve component of the armed forces, who is ordered to active
 duty by proper authority;
 (5)  is the child of a member of the armed forces of the
 United States, including the state military forces or a reserve
 component of the armed forces, who was injured or killed while
 serving on active duty; [or]
 (6)  is or ever has been in the conservatorship of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services following an adversary
 hearing held as provided by Section 262.201, Family Code; or
 (7)  is the child of a person eligible for the Star of
 Texas Award as:
 (A)  a peace officer under Section 3106.002,
 Government Code;
 (B)  a firefighter under Section 3106.003,
 Government Code; or
 (C)  an emergency medical first responder under
 Section 3106.004, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *