Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 12, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017