Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3576 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3576
1+By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 3576
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017;
3+ May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the investigation of, and release of information
612 concerning, communicable disease, including the Zika virus and
713 other high consequence communicable diseases.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Section 81.046(c), Health and Safety Code, as
1016 amended by Chapters 789 (H.B. 2646) and 1278 (S.B. 1574), Acts of
1117 the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and
1218 amended to read as follows:
1319 (c) Medical or epidemiological information, including
1420 information linking a person who is exposed to a person with a
1521 communicable disease, may be released:
1622 (1) for statistical purposes if released in a manner
1723 that prevents the identification of any person;
1824 (2) with the consent of each person identified in the
1925 information;
2026 (3) to medical personnel treating the individual,
2127 appropriate state agencies in this state or another state, a health
2228 authority or local health department in this state or another
2329 state, or federal, county, or district courts to comply with this
2430 chapter and related rules relating to the control and treatment of
2531 communicable diseases and health conditions or under another state
2632 or federal law that expressly authorizes the disclosure of this
2733 information;
2834 (4) to appropriate federal agencies, such as the
2935 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention [of the United States
3036 Public Health Service], but, except as provided under Subsection
3137 (c-3), the information must be limited to the name, address, sex,
3238 race, and occupation of the patient, the date of disease onset, the
3339 probable source of infection, and other requested information
3440 relating to the case or suspected case of a communicable disease or
3541 health condition;
3642 (5) to medical personnel to the extent necessary in a
3743 medical emergency to protect the health or life of the person
3844 identified in the information; [or]
3945 (6) to a designated infection control officer;
4046 (7) [(6)] to governmental entities that provide first
4147 responders who may respond to a situation involving a potential
4248 communicable disease of concern and need the information to
4349 properly respond to the situation; or
4450 (8) [(7)] to a local health department or health
4551 authority for a designated monitoring period based on the potential
4652 risk for developing symptoms of a communicable disease of concern.
4753 SECTION 2. Section 81.046, Health and Safety Code, is
4854 amended by adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
4955 (c-3) The following medical or epidemiological information
5056 relating to a person who has or is suspected of having a present or
5157 potential health condition resulting from exposure to a high
52- consequence communicable disease
53- as defined by the department,
54- including the Zika virus, may be released to an appropriate federal
55- agency:
58+ consequence communicable disease, such as the Zika virus, may be
59+ released to an appropriate federal agency:
5660 (1) the name, address, sex, race, and occupation of
5761 the person;
5862 (2) the date of the onset of the health condition;
5963 (3) the probable source of infection or exposure; and
6064 (4) other requested information relating to the case
6165 or suspected case of the infection.
6266 SECTION 3. Sections 81.061(a) and (c), Health and Safety
6367 Code, are amended to read as follows:
6468 (a) The department shall investigate the causes and effects
6569 of communicable disease and methods of prevention.
6670 (c) The department may investigate the existence of
6771 communicable disease in the state to determine the nature and
6872 extent of the disease and potential effects on the health of
6973 individuals and to formulate and evaluate the control measures used
7074 to protect the public health. A person shall provide records and
7175 other information to the department on request according to the
7276 department's written instructions.
7377 SECTION 4. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
7478 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
7579 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
7680 codes.
7781 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
78- ______________________________ ______________________________
79- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 3576 was passed by the House on May
81- 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, 1 present, not
82- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
83- No. 3576 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
84- 2 present, not voting.
85- ______________________________
86- Chief Clerk of the House
87- I certify that H.B. No. 3576 was passed by the Senate, with
88- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
89- 1.
90- ______________________________
91- Secretary of the Senate
92- APPROVED: __________________
93- Date
94- __________________
95- Governor
82+ * * * * *