Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3677 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/09/2017

                            85R2335 SLB-D
 By: Isaac H.B. No. 3677


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Heart of Texas Aquifer District and
 the dissolution of certain groundwater conservation districts;
 providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose
 assessments, fees, or surcharges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1. CREATION OF DISTRICT
 SECTION 1.1.  CREATION OF DISTRICT. Subtitle H, Title 6,
 Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Chapter 8892
 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8892. HEART OF TEXAS AQUIFER DISTRICT
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 8892.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of directors of the
 district.
 (2)  "Director" means a member of the board.
 (3)  "District" means the Heart of Texas Aquifer
 District.
 Sec. 8892.002.  NATURE OF DISTRICT. The district is a
 groundwater conservation district in Comal County created under and
 essential to accomplish the purposes of Section 59, Article XVI,
 Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 8892.003.  INITIAL DISTRICT TERRITORY. The initial
 territory of the district:
 (1)  consists of the territory of the following
 counties except as provided by Subdivision (2):
 (A)  Blanco;
 (B)  Burnet;
 (C)  Comal;
 (D)  Hays; and
 (E)  Kendall; and
 (2)  does not include territory included inside the
 territorial boundaries of the following districts as those
 boundaries are established on September 1, 2017:
 (A)  the Barton Springs-Edwards Aquifer
 Conservation District;
 (B)  the Edwards Aquifer Authority; or
 (C)  the Plum Creek Conservation District.
 SUBCHAPTER B. BOARD OF DIRECTORS
 Sec. 8892.051.  COMPOSITION OF BOARD. The district is
 governed by a board of five appointed directors.
 Sec. 8892.052.  TERMS AND APPOINTMENT OF DIRECTORS.
 Directors serve staggered four-year terms. Directors are appointed
 as follows:
 (1)  one director appointed by the Blanco County
 Commissioners Court;
 (2)  one director appointed by the Burnet County
 Commissioners Court;
 (3)  one director appointed by the Comal County
 Commissioners Court;
 (4)  one director appointed by the Hays County
 Commissioners Court; and
 (5)  one director appointed by the Kendall County
 Commissioners Court.
 Sec. 8892.053.  VACANCIES.  If there is a vacancy on the
 board, the commissioners court of the county that appointed the
 director whose position has become vacant shall appoint a person to
 fill the vacancy for the remainder of the term.
 SUBCHAPTER C. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 8892.101.  GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT POWERS
 AND DUTIES.  The district has the rights, powers, privileges,
 functions, and duties provided by the general law of this state,
 including Chapter 36, Water Code, applicable to groundwater
 conservation districts created under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution.
 Sec. 8892.102.  CONTRACTS. The district may contract with a
 state agency or political subdivision, including a municipality, a
 county, a river authority, or another district, to carry out any
 function of the district.
 SECTION 1.2.  APPOINTMENT OF DIRECTORS. Not later than
 September 1, 2018, the county commissioners courts of Blanco,
 Burnet, Comal, Hays, and Kendall Counties each shall appoint a
 member of the board of directors of the Heart of Texas Aquifer
 District as required by Section 8892.052, Special District Local
 Laws Code, as added by this Act.
 ARTICLE 2. TRANSFERS; DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICTS; REPEALER
 SECTION 2.1.  DEFINITIONS. In this article:
 (1)  "Aquifer district" means the Heart of Texas
 Aquifer District.
 (2)  "Districts" means the following:
 (A)  the Blanco-Pedernales Groundwater
 Conservation District;
 (B)  the Central Texas Groundwater Conservation
 District;
 (C)  the Comal Trinity Groundwater Conservation
 District;
 (D)  the Cow Creek Groundwater Conservation
 District; and
 (E)  the Hays Trinity Groundwater Conservation
 District.
 SECTION 2.2.  TRANSFERS. (a) Not earlier than September 1,
 2018, and not later than December 1, 2018, each of the districts
 shall:
 (1)  transfer the district's assets, debts, and
 contractual rights and obligations to the aquifer district; and
 (2)  provide notice and make recordings of the
 transfers under this section as required by the Water Code,
 Property Code, and other law.
 (b)  On December 1, 2018, the powers, functions, and duties
 of the districts are transferred to the aquifer district.
 SECTION 2.3.  PROHIBITION ON CERTAIN ACTIONS. (a) Before
 December 1, 2018, the board of directors of the aquifer district:
 (1)  may not take any regulatory action under Chapter
 36, Water Code;
 (2)  shall adopt rules for the administration of the
 aquifer district under Chapter 36, Water Code; and
 (3)  may hire employees of the aquifer district.
 (b)  On and after December 1, 2018, the districts have no
 authority to take any action under Chapter 36, Water Code.
 SECTION 2.4.  DISSOLUTION OF CERTAIN DISTRICTS. On January
 1, 2019:
 (1)  the districts are dissolved;
 (2)  the terms of the directors of the districts
 expire; and
 (3)  the aquifer district shall provide to the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality notice of the dissolution of
 the districts.
 SECTION 2.5.  REPEALER. On January 1, 2019:
 (1)  Chapter 1147 (H.B. 3229), Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, is repealed; and
 (2)  the following chapters of the Special District
 Local Laws Code are repealed:
 (A)  Chapter 8810;
 (B)  Chapter 8838;
 (C)  Chapter 8843; and
 (D)  Chapter 8875.
 ARTICLE 3. EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 3.1.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 September 1, 2017.