1 | 1 | | 85R11820 KJE-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Johnson of Harris H.B. No. 3730 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the development of a statewide online education and |
---|
8 | 8 | | career advising tool and to a study and report on certain courses |
---|
9 | 9 | | offered for college credit to public school students. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Sections 28.0092 and 28.0093 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 28.0092. ONLINE EDUCATION AND CAREER ADVISING TOOL. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a) In this section, "institution of higher education" has the |
---|
15 | 15 | | meaning assigned by Section 61.003. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) The agency shall develop and implement a statewide |
---|
17 | 17 | | online education and career advising tool to assist children in |
---|
18 | 18 | | making informed, meaningful, and attainable postsecondary and |
---|
19 | 19 | | career plans. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (c) The online education and career advising tool must |
---|
21 | 21 | | include: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) an individualized career pathway generator that |
---|
23 | 23 | | assists a child in selecting a career and identifying the secondary |
---|
24 | 24 | | and postsecondary courses the child should take to advance toward |
---|
25 | 25 | | that career; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) information regarding: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (A) any local, regional, or statewide |
---|
28 | 28 | | articulation agreements regarding dual credit programs or the |
---|
29 | 29 | | transfer of course credit between institutions of higher education; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (B) the postsecondary and career options |
---|
31 | 31 | | associated with each endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1), |
---|
32 | 32 | | including the dual credit courses related to each endorsement that |
---|
33 | 33 | | apply toward a certificate or degree program at an institution of |
---|
34 | 34 | | higher education; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (C) any stackable degree programs provided by an |
---|
36 | 36 | | institution of higher education through which a student may obtain |
---|
37 | 37 | | a series of credentials as the student progresses through the |
---|
38 | 38 | | program; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (D) existing and anticipated employment |
---|
40 | 40 | | opportunities statewide and in a child's community, aligned to |
---|
41 | 41 | | state and regional workforce needs; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (E) anticipated earnings in various careers; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (F) local, regional, and statewide career |
---|
44 | 44 | | training and certification programs, including the requirements, |
---|
45 | 45 | | costs, and available options for those programs; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (G) the time and cost required for and other |
---|
47 | 47 | | expenses related to various postsecondary and career options. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (d) In developing and implementing the online education and |
---|
49 | 49 | | career advising tool, the agency shall consult with the Texas |
---|
50 | 50 | | Higher Education Coordinating Board and the Texas Workforce |
---|
51 | 51 | | Commission. On request by the agency, the coordinating board and |
---|
52 | 52 | | the commission shall provide to the agency any data maintained by |
---|
53 | 53 | | the coordinating board or commission that is necessary to develop |
---|
54 | 54 | | the tool. |
---|
55 | 55 | | Sec. 28.0093. STUDY ON CERTAIN COURSES OFFERED FOR COLLEGE |
---|
56 | 56 | | CREDIT. (a) In this section: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher |
---|
58 | 58 | | Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) "Course offered for college credit" means an |
---|
60 | 60 | | advanced placement course, a dual credit course, or a career and |
---|
61 | 61 | | technical education course offered for college credit. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (b) The agency and coordinating board jointly shall conduct |
---|
63 | 63 | | a study on courses offered for college credit in the state. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (c) The study must evaluate: |
---|
65 | 65 | | (1) the level of rigor of the courses most commonly |
---|
66 | 66 | | offered for college credit to a student enrolled in a school |
---|
67 | 67 | | district; and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) potential incentives that may be developed to |
---|
69 | 69 | | encourage school districts and public institutions of higher |
---|
70 | 70 | | education to ensure that courses offered for college credit are of |
---|
71 | 71 | | high quality. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (d) Not later than September 1, 2020, the agency and |
---|
73 | 73 | | coordinating board jointly shall submit to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
74 | 74 | | governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and standing |
---|
75 | 75 | | legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over education a |
---|
76 | 76 | | report on the results of the study and any recommendations for |
---|
77 | 77 | | legislative or other action. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 2. The Texas Education Agency shall develop and |
---|
80 | 80 | | implement the online education and career advising tool as provided |
---|
81 | 81 | | by Section 28.0092, Education Code, as added by this Act, according |
---|
82 | 82 | | to the following schedule: |
---|
83 | 83 | | (1) not later than September 1, 2018, an initial |
---|
84 | 84 | | version of the tool that incorporates as many elements required |
---|
85 | 85 | | under that section as feasible must be developed and implemented; |
---|
86 | 86 | | and |
---|
87 | 87 | | (2) not later than September 1, 2019, the full version |
---|
88 | 88 | | of the tool that incorporates all of the elements required under |
---|
89 | 89 | | that section must be developed and implemented. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
91 | 91 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
92 | 92 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
93 | 93 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
94 | 94 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|