Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3730 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/09/2017

                            85R11820 KJE-D
 By: Johnson of Harris H.B. No. 3730


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of a statewide online education and
 career advising tool and to a study and report on certain courses
 offered for college credit to public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 28.0092 and 28.0093 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0092.  ONLINE EDUCATION AND CAREER ADVISING TOOL.
 (a) In this section, "institution of higher education" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  The agency shall develop and implement a statewide
 online education and career advising tool to assist children in
 making informed, meaningful, and attainable postsecondary and
 career plans.
 (c)  The online education and career advising tool must
 include:
 (1)  an individualized career pathway generator that
 assists a child in selecting a career and identifying the secondary
 and postsecondary courses the child should take to advance toward
 that career; and
 (2)  information regarding:
 (A)  any local, regional, or statewide
 articulation agreements regarding dual credit programs or the
 transfer of course credit between institutions of higher education;
 (B)  the postsecondary and career options
 associated with each endorsement under Section 28.025(c-1),
 including the dual credit courses related to each endorsement that
 apply toward a certificate or degree program at an institution of
 higher education;
 (C)  any stackable degree programs provided by an
 institution of higher education through which a student may obtain
 a series of credentials as the student progresses through the
 program;
 (D)  existing and anticipated employment
 opportunities statewide and in a child's community, aligned to
 state and regional workforce needs;
 (E)  anticipated earnings in various careers;
 (F)  local, regional, and statewide career
 training and certification programs, including the requirements,
 costs, and available options for those programs; and
 (G)  the time and cost required for and other
 expenses related to various postsecondary and career options.
 (d)  In developing and implementing the online education and
 career advising tool, the agency shall consult with the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board and the Texas Workforce
 Commission.  On request by the agency, the coordinating board and
 the commission shall provide to the agency any data maintained by
 the coordinating board or commission that is necessary to develop
 the tool.
 Sec. 28.0093.  STUDY ON CERTAIN COURSES OFFERED FOR COLLEGE
 CREDIT. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "Course offered for college credit" means an
 advanced placement course, a dual credit course, or a career and
 technical education course offered for college credit.
 (b)  The agency and coordinating board jointly shall conduct
 a study on courses offered for college credit in the state.
 (c)  The study must evaluate:
 (1)  the level of rigor of the courses most commonly
 offered for college credit to a student enrolled in a school
 district; and
 (2)  potential incentives that may be developed to
 encourage school districts and public institutions of higher
 education to ensure that courses offered for college credit are of
 high quality.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the agency and
 coordinating board jointly shall submit to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and standing
 legislative committees with primary jurisdiction over education a
 report on the results of the study and any recommendations for
 legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Education Agency shall develop and
 implement the online education and career advising tool as provided
 by Section 28.0092, Education Code, as added by this Act, according
 to the following schedule:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2018, an initial
 version of the tool that incorporates as many elements required
 under that section as feasible must be developed and implemented;
 and
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2019, the full version
 of the tool that incorporates all of the elements required under
 that section must be developed and implemented.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.