House
|
05/08/2017
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|