Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill April 28, 2017