1 | | - | H.B. No. 3879 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3879 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 22, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 22, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3879 By: Estes |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to nonlawyer representation in an appeal of an eviction |
---|
6 | 14 | | suit. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 24.011, Property Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 24.011. NONLAWYER REPRESENTATION. (a) In eviction |
---|
11 | 19 | | suits in justice court for nonpayment of rent or holding over beyond |
---|
12 | 20 | | a rental term, the parties may represent themselves or be |
---|
13 | 21 | | represented by their authorized agents, who need not be attorneys. |
---|
14 | 22 | | In any eviction suit in justice court, an authorized agent |
---|
15 | 23 | | requesting or obtaining a default judgment need not be an attorney. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (b) In an appeal of an eviction suit for nonpayment of rent |
---|
17 | | - | in a county or district court, an owner of a multifamily residential |
---|
18 | | - | property may be represented by the owner's authorized agent, who |
---|
19 | | - | need not be an attorney, or, if the owner is a corporation or other |
---|
20 | | - | entity, by an employee, owner, officer, or partner of the entity, |
---|
21 | | - | who need not be an attorney. |
---|
| 25 | + | in a county or district court, the parties may represent |
---|
| 26 | + | themselves, or a party may be represented by the party's authorized |
---|
| 27 | + | agent, who need not be an attorney, including, if the party is a |
---|
| 28 | + | corporation or other entity, by an employee, owner, officer, or |
---|
| 29 | + | partner of the entity, who need not be an attorney. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3879 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
28 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
29 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
30 | | - | H.B. No. 3879 on May 25, 2017, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
31 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
32 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
33 | | - | on H.B. No. 3879 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
34 | | - | Nays 0, 4 present, not voting. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
37 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3879 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
38 | | - | amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
39 | | - | 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
40 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
41 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
42 | | - | 3879 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
45 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Date |
---|
47 | | - | __________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 33 | + | * * * * * |
---|