Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3879 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2017

                            H.B. No. 3879


 AN ACT
 relating to nonlawyer representation in an appeal of an eviction
 suit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.011, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.011.  NONLAWYER REPRESENTATION. (a) In eviction
 suits in justice court for nonpayment of rent or holding over beyond
 a rental term, the parties may represent themselves or be
 represented by their authorized agents, who need not be attorneys.
 In any eviction suit in justice court, an authorized agent
 requesting or obtaining a default judgment need not be an attorney.
 (b)  In an appeal of an eviction suit for nonpayment of rent
 in a county or district court, an owner of a multifamily residential
 property may be represented by the owner's authorized agent, who
 need not be an attorney, or, if the owner is a corporation or other
 entity, by an employee, owner, officer, or partner of the entity,
 who need not be an attorney.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an appeal taken on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3879 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3879 on May 25, 2017, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3879 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, 4 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3879 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3879 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor