Senate | 05/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed |