Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4032 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 4032
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to annual limitations on the reimbursement of expenses
 incurred by district court reporters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.055, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  The expenses reimbursed under this section are subject
 to annual limitations based on the size of the judicial district.
 Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), a [A] court reporter may not
 receive more than the maximum reimbursement amount set for the
 reporter's judicial district in any one year. The maximum
 reimbursement amount is as follows:
 (1)  if the judicial district contains two counties,
 the maximum reimbursement amount is $400;
 (2)  if the judicial district contains three counties,
 the maximum reimbursement amount is $800;
 (3)  if the judicial district contains four counties,
 the maximum reimbursement amount is $1,400; and
 (4)  if the judicial district contains five or more
 counties, the maximum reimbursement amount is $2,000.
 (d-1)  For expenses that exceed the annual maximum
 reimbursement amount set for a court reporter's judicial district
 under Subsection (d), the reporter may receive reimbursement from
 the county for which the expenses were incurred on approval of the
 commissioners court of the county.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to
 expenses incurred by a court reporter on or after the effective date
 of this Act. Expenses incurred before the effective date of this
 Act are governed by the law in effect on the date the expenses were
 incurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *