Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017