Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4061 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2017

                            85R13188 DMS-D
 By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 4061


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force on intentional violent
 deaths.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  In this Act:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force on intentional
 violent deaths.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The department shall establish a task force
 on intentional violent deaths. The task force shall develop a
 written plan establishing measures and a timeline to reduce
 intentional violent deaths in this state, including suicides and
 homicides. The department shall:
 (1)  analyze current available local and state data
 relating to intentional violent deaths and:
 (A)  identify gaps in the data; and
 (B)  recommend measures to improve data
 collection;
 (2)  analyze, to the extent feasible, the impact mental
 illness has on intentional violent deaths;
 (3)  review current laws in this state and other states
 pertaining to addressing and preventing intentional violent
 deaths; and
 (4)  review national best practices relating to
 policies on reducing intentional violent deaths.
 (b)  The task force is composed of 11 members as follows:
 (1)  two members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one member appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one member appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives;
 (4)  one representative of each of the following
 agencies appointed by the executive head of the agency:
 (A)  the department;
 (B)  the Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas;
 (C)  the Texas Department of Criminal Justice; and
 (D)  the Texas Suicide Prevention Council;
 (5)  one representative from a law enforcement
 organization, appointed by the commissioner of state health
 services; and
 (6)  two representatives from public health advocacy
 organizations, appointed by the department.
 (c)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation or
 reimbursement for expenses incurred in performing the member's
 duties.
 (d)  Not later than October 1, 2017, each person responsible
 for appointing members to the task force shall appoint the members
 as required by Subsection (b) of this section.
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the task force shall
 submit its written plan to the governor and members of the
 legislature.
 SECTION 3.  The task force is abolished and this Act expires
 September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.