Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017