1 | | - | H.B. No. 4102 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Neave, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 4102 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4102 By: Whitmire |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing |
---|
6 | 14 | | evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex |
---|
7 | 15 | | offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, |
---|
10 | 18 | | is amended by adding Section 502.414 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 502.414. VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION FOR EVIDENCE TESTING |
---|
12 | 20 | | GRANT PROGRAM. (a) When a person registers or renews the |
---|
13 | 21 | | registration of a motor vehicle under this chapter, the person may |
---|
14 | 22 | | contribute any amount to the evidence testing grant program |
---|
15 | 23 | | established under Section 772.00715, Government Code. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (b) The department shall provide, in a conspicuous manner, |
---|
17 | 25 | | an opportunity to contribute to the evidence testing grant program |
---|
18 | 26 | | in any registration renewal system used by the department. |
---|
19 | 27 | | (c) If a person makes a contribution under this section and |
---|
20 | 28 | | does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county |
---|
21 | 29 | | assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution |
---|
22 | 30 | | to the person's registration fee. |
---|
23 | 31 | | (d) The county assessor-collector shall send any |
---|
24 | 32 | | contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit |
---|
25 | 33 | | to the credit of the evidence testing account established under |
---|
26 | 34 | | Section 772.00716, Government Code, at least once every three |
---|
27 | 35 | | months. Before sending the money to the comptroller, the |
---|
28 | 36 | | department may deduct money equal to the amount of reasonable |
---|
29 | 37 | | expenses for administering this section. |
---|
30 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter H, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, |
---|
31 | | - | is amended by adding Section 502.415 to read as follows: |
---|
32 | | - | Sec. 502.415. VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION TO ENDING |
---|
33 | | - | HOMELESSNESS FUND. (a) When a person registers or renews the |
---|
34 | | - | registration of a motor vehicle under this chapter, the person may |
---|
35 | | - | contribute any amount to the Ending Homelessness fund under |
---|
36 | | - | Subsection (f). |
---|
37 | | - | (b) The department shall provide, in a conspicuous manner, |
---|
38 | | - | an opportunity to contribute to the Ending Homelessness fund in any |
---|
39 | | - | registration renewal system used by the department. |
---|
40 | | - | (c) If a person makes a contribution under this section and |
---|
41 | | - | does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county |
---|
42 | | - | assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution |
---|
43 | | - | to the person's registration fee. |
---|
44 | | - | (d) The county assessor-collector shall send any |
---|
45 | | - | contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit |
---|
46 | | - | to the Ending Homelessness fund before the 31st day after the date |
---|
47 | | - | the contribution is made. |
---|
48 | | - | (e) The department shall consult with the Texas Department |
---|
49 | | - | of Housing and Community Affairs in performing the department's |
---|
50 | | - | duties under this section. |
---|
51 | | - | (f) The Ending Homelessness fund is created as a trust fund |
---|
52 | | - | outside the state treasury to be held by the comptroller and |
---|
53 | | - | administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
54 | | - | Affairs as trustee. The fund is composed of money deposited to the |
---|
55 | | - | credit of the fund under this section. Money in the fund shall be |
---|
56 | | - | used to provide grants to counties and municipalities to combat |
---|
57 | | - | homelessness. |
---|
58 | | - | (g) The Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs |
---|
59 | | - | shall adopt rules governing application for grants from the Ending |
---|
60 | | - | Homelessness fund and the issuance of those grants. |
---|
61 | | - | SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is |
---|
| 38 | + | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is |
---|
62 | 39 | | amended by adding Sections 772.00715 and 772.00716 to read as |
---|
63 | 40 | | follows: |
---|
64 | 41 | | Sec. 772.00715. EVIDENCE TESTING GRANT PROGRAM. (a) In |
---|
65 | 42 | | this section: |
---|
66 | 43 | | (1) "Accredited crime laboratory" has the meaning |
---|
67 | 44 | | assigned by Section 420.003. |
---|
68 | 45 | | (2) "Criminal justice division" means the criminal |
---|
69 | 46 | | justice division established under Section 772.006. |
---|
70 | 47 | | (3) "Grant program" means the evidence testing grant |
---|
71 | 48 | | program established under this section. |
---|
72 | 49 | | (4) "Law enforcement agency" means: |
---|
73 | 50 | | (A) the police department of a municipality; |
---|
74 | 51 | | (B) the sheriff's office of a county; or |
---|
75 | 52 | | (C) a constable's office of a county. |
---|
76 | 53 | | (b) The criminal justice division shall establish and |
---|
77 | 54 | | administer a grant program and shall disburse funds to assist law |
---|
78 | 55 | | enforcement agencies or counties in testing evidence collected in |
---|
79 | 56 | | relation to a sexual assault or other sex offense. |
---|
80 | 57 | | (c) Grant funds may be used only for the testing by an |
---|
81 | 58 | | accredited crime laboratory of evidence that was collected in |
---|
82 | 59 | | relation to a sexual assault or other sex offense. |
---|
83 | 60 | | (d) The criminal justice division: |
---|
84 | 61 | | (1) may establish additional eligibility criteria for |
---|
85 | 62 | | grant applicants; and |
---|
86 | 63 | | (2) shall establish: |
---|
87 | 64 | | (A) grant application procedures; |
---|
88 | 65 | | (B) guidelines relating to grant amounts; and |
---|
89 | 66 | | (C) criteria for evaluating grant applications. |
---|
90 | 67 | | (e) The criminal justice division shall include in the |
---|
91 | 68 | | biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) detailed |
---|
92 | 69 | | reporting of the results and performance of the grant program. |
---|
103 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
104 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
105 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
106 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4102 was passed by the House on May 6, |
---|
107 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
108 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
109 | | - | No. 4102 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 4, |
---|
110 | | - | 2 present, not voting, and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 159 |
---|
111 | | - | authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4102 on May 28, 2017, by |
---|
112 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 11, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
113 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
114 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
115 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4102 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
116 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
117 | | - | 0, and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 159 authorizing certain |
---|
118 | | - | corrections in H.B. No. 4102 on May 29, 2017, by the following vote: |
---|
119 | | - | Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
120 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
121 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
122 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
123 | | - | Date |
---|
124 | | - | __________________ |
---|
125 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 79 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
| 80 | + | * * * * * |
---|