House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed |