Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4303 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 30, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017