House
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|