House | 05/24/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Filed |