Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB441 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 441
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to operation of public schools on Memorial Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.081, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  A school district may not provide student instruction on
 Memorial Day. If a school district would be required to provide
 student instruction on Memorial Day to compensate for minutes of
 instruction lost because of school closures caused by disaster,
 flood, extreme weather conditions, fuel curtailment, or another
 calamity, the commissioner shall approve the instruction of
 students for fewer than the number of minutes required under
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *