Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB492 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 492
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a waiver for certain programs from youth camp
 licensing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 141, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 141.0025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.0025.  WAIVER; APPEAL. (a) The department may
 grant a waiver from the requirements of this chapter to a program
 that:
 (1)  is sponsored by a religious organization as
 defined by Section 464.051;
 (2)  has been in operation for at least 30 consecutive
 years;
 (3)  operates one camp for not more than seven days in
 any year;
 (4)  has not more than 80 campers;
 (5)  is conducted by adult participants who are all
 volunteers;
 (6)  operates in a county with a population of at least
 4,400 but not more than 4,750; and
 (7)  ensures that background checks are conducted on
 and the training required under Section 141.0095 is completed by
 each adult participating in the program.
 (b)  A waiver granted by the department under Subsection (a)
 is valid until the waiver is revoked for cause by the department.
 (c)  A person who operates a program for which an application
 for a waiver under this section has been denied or for which a
 waiver under this section has been revoked may appeal the action in
 the manner provided for appeal of contested cases under Chapter
 2001, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 Section 141.0025, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *