E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
January 8, 2019
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#625
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#606
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|