E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3887
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2106
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#547
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1111
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 366
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 366
|
House
|
12/12/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|