Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1361 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#523 | Journal Page: 2083 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2083 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2083 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Turner | Journal Page: 2028 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 388 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 388 | |
House | 12/13/2016 | Filed |