E | 06/12/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4242 | |
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6059 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6061 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4817 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3031 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1296 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | RV#382 | Journal Page: 1815 |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 275 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 275 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |