Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB59 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 59
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017;
3- May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4- Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 59
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to certain lottery prize winners' choice to remain
126 anonymous.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Section 466.015, Government Code, is amended by
159 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
1610 (b-1) The commission shall adopt rules governing
1711 nondisclosure of the personally identifiable information of
1812 certain lottery prize winners under Section 466.411.
1913 SECTION 2. Section 466.022(b), Government Code, is amended
2014 to read as follows:
2115 (b) In addition to commission records excepted from
2216 disclosure under Chapter 552, the following information is
2317 confidential and is exempt from disclosure:
2418 (1) security plans and procedures of the commission
2519 designed to ensure the integrity and security of the operation of
2620 the lottery;
2721 (2) information of a nature that is designed to ensure
2822 the integrity and security of the selection of winning tickets or
2923 numbers in the lottery, other than information describing the
3024 general procedures for selecting winning tickets or numbers; [and]
3125 (3) the street address and telephone number of a prize
3226 winner, if the prize winner has not consented to the release of the
3327 information; and
3428 (4) except as otherwise authorized by Section 466.411,
3529 all personally identifiable information of a natural person who is:
3630 (A) a lottery prize winner and who has chosen to
3731 remain anonymous under Section 466.411; or
3832 (B) an owner of a beneficial interest in a legal
3933 entity that is a lottery prize winner and who has chosen to remain
4034 anonymous under Section 466.411.
4135 SECTION 3. Subchapter I, Chapter 466, Government Code, is
4236 amended by adding Section 466.411 to read as follows:
4337 Sec. 466.411. CHOICE BY CERTAIN PRIZE WINNERS TO REMAIN
4438 ANONYMOUS. (a) Subject to Subsection (b), a natural person who is
4539 a prize winner of a lottery prize in an amount equal to $1 million or
4640 more, or who is an owner of a beneficial interest in a legal entity
4741 that is a prize winner of a lottery prize in an amount equal to $1
4842 million or more, may on the date the winner claims the prize choose
4943 to remain anonymous and prohibit all personally identifiable
5044 information from being released to the public.
5145 (b) The commission may release or disclose the personally
5246 identifiable information of a natural person who is a lottery prize
5347 winner if the person chooses to have the prize paid in periodic
5448 installments. The commission may only disclose the information on
5549 or after the 30th day after the date the person claims the lottery
5650 prize if the person chooses to remain anonymous under Subsection
5751 (a).
5852 (c) For purposes of this section, the amount of a lottery
5953 prize is the total amount of prize money paid to a prize winner for a
6054 single lottery prize claim, whether paid in one payment or in
6155 periodic installments, before deducting any federal tax
6256 withholdings or other deductions required by law.
6357 (d) This section does not prohibit release of a natural
6458 person prize winner's city or county of residence or prevent the
6559 commission from releasing the person's personally identifiable
6660 information to the Health and Human Services Commission or as
6761 necessary to comply with Section 466.407 or 466.4075.
6862 SECTION 4. (a) Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
6963 Lottery Commission shall adopt the rules and procedures necessary
7064 to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 466,
7165 Government Code.
7266 (b) Section 466.411, Government Code, as added by this Act,
7367 applies only to an initial claim for a lottery prize in an amount
7468 equal to $1 million or more that is submitted to the Texas Lottery
7569 Commission on or after January 1, 2018.
7670 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
77- * * * * *
71+ ______________________________ ______________________________
72+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
73+ I certify that H.B. No. 59 was passed by the House on April
74+ 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not
75+ voting.
76+ ______________________________
77+ Chief Clerk of the House
78+ I certify that H.B. No. 59 was passed by the Senate on May 24,
79+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
80+ ______________________________
81+ Secretary of the Senate
82+ APPROVED: _____________________
83+ Date
84+ _____________________
85+ Governor