Senate | 05/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1726 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2905 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | RV#1016 | Journal Page: 2905 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2905 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2904 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2876 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2876 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 12/13/2016 | Filed |