House | 04/20/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 492 | Journal Page: 1692 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 368 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 368 | |
House | 12/14/2016 | Filed |