Senate | 05/22/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2316 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2316 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1296 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | RV#383 | Journal Page: 1815 |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |