E | 05/23/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4837 | |
E | 05/15/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3606 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1946 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3486 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3492 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3388 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1687 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 837 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#96 | Journal Page: 783 |
House | 03/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 755 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 755 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/08/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 12/19/2016 | Filed |