1 | | - | By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 641 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
4 | | - | Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported favorably |
---|
5 | | - | by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent to |
---|
6 | | - | printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 641 |
---|
11 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 5 | | relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission. |
---|
13 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
15 | 8 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 9 | | (b) Not later than July 30, 2021 [2017], the commission |
---|
17 | 10 | | shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, |
---|
18 | 11 | | speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees |
---|
19 | 12 | | of the legislature. |
---|
20 | 13 | | SECTION 2. Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
21 | 14 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 15 | | Sec. 12.058. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
23 | 16 | | expires December 31, 2021 [2017]. |
---|
24 | 17 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
25 | 18 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
26 | 19 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
27 | 20 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
28 | 21 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
29 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 22 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 23 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 24 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 641 was passed by the House on March |
---|
| 25 | + | 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 26 | + | voting. |
---|
| 27 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 28 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 29 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 641 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 30 | + | 11, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 31 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 32 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 33 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | Date |
---|
| 35 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | Governor |
---|