E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 686
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 813
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#99
|
Journal Page: 812
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
12/21/2016
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|