Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB651 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 651
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 16, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election date of the board of directors of the Rusk
 County Groundwater Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11(b), Chapter 764, Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  On the uniform election date in November [first Saturday
 in May] of each [subsequent] even-numbered year [following the
 election], the appropriate number of directors shall be elected.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11(a), Chapter 764, Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  (a) A director of the board of the Rusk County
 Groundwater Conservation District who is serving on the day before
 the effective date of this Act shall serve until the director's term
 expires.  A director whose term expires in May 2018 shall serve
 until the director's successor has qualified following the
 directors' election held on the uniform election date in November
 2018 in accordance with Section 11, Chapter 764, Acts of the 78th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2003, as amended by this Act.  A
 director whose term expires in May 2020 shall serve until the
 director's successor has qualified following the directors'
 election held on the uniform election date in November 2020.
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *