Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1565
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#243
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1111
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
House
|
12/20/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|