E | 06/15/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3995 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1431 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1126 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#153 | Journal Page: 1125 |
House | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1125 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1125 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 470 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 470 | |
House | 12/21/2016 | Filed |