Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB678 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wu (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 678
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 10, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for the entering of a plea or a
 stipulation of evidence by a child subject to a determinate
 sentence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.10, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), the [The] hearings
 provided by Sections 54.03, 54.04, and 54.05 may not be held before
 a referee if the grand jury has approved of the petition and the
 child is subject to a determinate sentence.
 (f)  When the state and a child who is subject to a
 determinate sentence agree to the disposition of the case, wholly
 or partly, a referee or associate judge may hold a hearing for the
 purpose of allowing the child to enter a plea or stipulation of
 evidence.  After the hearing under this subsection, the referee or
 associate judge shall transmit the referee's or associate judge's
 written findings and recommendations regarding the plea or
 stipulation of evidence to the juvenile court judge for
 consideration.  The juvenile court judge may accept or reject the
 plea or stipulation of evidence in accordance with Section
 54.03(j).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, conduct occurs before the effective date
 of this Act if any element of the conduct occurs before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *