Senate | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#644 | Journal Page: 2328 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 369 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 369 | |
House | 12/22/2016 | Filed |