Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB789 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Meyer (Senate Sponsor - Huffines) H.B. No. 789
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to minimum scores required for students in certain school
 districts to pass an examination for acceleration or for credit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  This subsection applies only to a school district
 surrounded by a school district described by Section 11.065(a).
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a school
 district's board of trustees may establish a minimum required score
 for each section of an examination for acceleration or an
 examination for credit approved by the board under Subsection (a)
 that is higher than the minimum required scores under Subsections
 (b) and (c), respectively. A minimum required score established by
 a board of trustees under this subsection:
 (1)  may be no greater than a score in the 90th
 percentile;
 (2)  must be established before the beginning of a
 school year for examinations to be administered in the school year;
 and
 (3)  must apply for at least the entire school year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *