Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB799 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 3, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 15, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2017