Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB799 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murr, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 799
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 20, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the persons authorized to conduct an inquest in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 27,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. CONDUCTING COURT AND INQUESTS
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 27, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 27.0545 to read as follows:
 Sec. 27.0545.  EXCHANGE OF BENCHES: INQUESTS.  (a)  If a
 justice of the peace or the county judge of a county to which
 Subchapter A, Chapter 49, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies is
 not available to conduct an inquest into a person's death occurring
 in the county, the justice of the peace of the precinct in which the
 death occurred or the county judge may request a justice of the
 peace of another county to which that subchapter applies to conduct
 the inquest.
 (b)  A justice of the peace who on request conducts an
 inquest under this section shall, not later than the fifth day after
 the date the inquest is initiated, transfer all information related
 to the inquest to the justice of the peace of the precinct in which
 the death occurred for final disposition of the matter.
 (c)  A justice of the peace who conducts an inquest under
 this section is not entitled to receive from the commissioners
 court of the county in which the death occurred any compensation,
 other than mileage, for conducting the inquest.
 SECTION 3.  Article 49.07(c), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  If a justice of the peace or the county judge
 serving the county in which the body or body part was found is not
 available to conduct an inquest, a person required to give notice
 under this article may ask the justice of the peace of the precinct
 in which the body or body part was found or the county judge to
 request a justice of the peace of another county to which this
 subchapter applies to conduct the inquest.  The justice of the peace
 that conducts the inquest shall, not later than the fifth day after
 the date the inquest is initiated, transfer all information related
 to the inquest to the justice of the peace of the precinct in which
 the body or body part was found for final disposition of the matter.
 All expenses related to the inquest must be paid as provided by this
 chapter.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *