Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1014
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
01/04/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|