1 | 1 | | 85R5589 JTS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Blanco H.B. No. 828 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for Vietnam |
---|
8 | 8 | | veterans. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 504.312(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) The department shall issue: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) specialty license plates that include the Vietnam |
---|
14 | 14 | | Service Medal image to a veteran: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (A) who served in the United States armed forces |
---|
16 | 16 | | in the Republic of Vietnam or waters contiguous to the Republic of |
---|
17 | 17 | | Vietnam during the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and |
---|
18 | 18 | | ending on May 7, 1975; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) whose United States Department of Defense |
---|
20 | 20 | | Form DD-214 lists either the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal |
---|
21 | 21 | | (Vietnam) or the Vietnam Service Medal; or |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) specialty license plates that include the National |
---|
23 | 23 | | Defense Service Medal image to a veteran: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (A) who served in the United States armed forces |
---|
25 | 25 | | during the period beginning on August 5, 1964, and ending on May 7, |
---|
26 | 26 | | 1975; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | (B) whose United States Department of Defense |
---|
28 | 28 | | Form DD-214 lists the National Defense Service Medal but not a medal |
---|
29 | 29 | | described by Subdivision (1) [specialty license plates for persons |
---|
30 | 30 | | who served in the United States armed forces: |
---|
31 | 31 | | [(1) during the period beginning on January 1, 1961, |
---|
32 | 32 | | and ending on August 14, 1974, and who received the National Defense |
---|
33 | 33 | | Service Medal; or |
---|
34 | 34 | | [(2) in a combat zone in the Republic of Vietnam during |
---|
35 | 35 | | the period beginning on July 1, 1958, and ending on March 28, 1973, |
---|
36 | 36 | | and who received the Vietnam Service Medal]. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|