85R5589 JTS-D By: Blanco H.B. No. 828 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for Vietnam veterans. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 504.312(a), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The department shall issue: (1) specialty license plates that include the Vietnam Service Medal image to a veteran: (A) who served in the United States armed forces in the Republic of Vietnam or waters contiguous to the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and ending on May 7, 1975; and (B) whose United States Department of Defense Form DD-214 lists either the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal (Vietnam) or the Vietnam Service Medal; or (2) specialty license plates that include the National Defense Service Medal image to a veteran: (A) who served in the United States armed forces during the period beginning on August 5, 1964, and ending on May 7, 1975; and (B) whose United States Department of Defense Form DD-214 lists the National Defense Service Medal but not a medal described by Subdivision (1) [specialty license plates for persons who served in the United States armed forces: [(1) during the period beginning on January 1, 1961, and ending on August 14, 1974, and who received the National Defense Service Medal; or [(2) in a combat zone in the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on July 1, 1958, and ending on March 28, 1973, and who received the Vietnam Service Medal]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.