E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6063 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3995 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1915 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#629 | Journal Page: 2314 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2219 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2219 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 454 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 454 | |
House | 01/09/2017 | Filed |