Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB919 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 10, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 28, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017